User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 05:28, 15 September 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+108) . . m User:Red Revolver/Murgs Degviela (This has been another interruption with an Eebit tune up! We now return to your regularly-scheduled Starr programming.)
- 03:43, 15 September 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+68) . . m List of Major Manaverse Races
- 22:56, 29 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+1,535) . . N Talk:Pricilla Starkey (Created page with "==Archived Data== Currently storing the following sections here. Pending a rewrite and distributing data to the various sections. --~~~~ ===Strengths and Immunities=== As a ...") (current)
- 23:28, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-46) . . m Vodera
- 23:15, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . m Hirasu
- 23:14, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Ziolang Hirasu
- 23:13, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . m Template:Planets Navbar
- 23:12, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . m Template:Planets Navbar/Main (Added Deveron) (current)
- 23:11, 26 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . N File:DeveronIcon.png (A WIP version of the Deveron planetary icon.) (current)
- 19:09, 21 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+96) . . m Forvolrasuls
- 07:56, 20 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . m Template:Planets Navbar
- 07:55, 20 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . m Template:Planets Navbar/Main (Added Greniou)
- 07:54, 20 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+176) . . N File:GreniouIcon.png (A WIP version of the Grenian planetary icon. I do want to tackle it again since I'm not 100% satisfied with the final product. Starr, I'd like your input on it when you see it.) (current)
- 09:12, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+12) . . m Deveron (→Notable Characters)
- 08:11, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Starlight Thunderscale
- 08:11, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Skyking Súndávr
- 08:11, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Vol en-ait Rae
- 08:10, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Skyking Shyr
- 08:10, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Mimring Thunderscale
- 08:10, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Kyton Haryn
- 08:10, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Grodisflare
- 08:09, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Deathstorm
- 08:09, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m David Shaver
- 08:08, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . m Careodry
- 08:07, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+45) . . m Jason Shaver
- 08:04, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-20) . . m Template:Planets Navbar/Main ([ctn'd from previous because i suck] removed Ea, Cytieresk, Galamion, The Misty Isle)
- 08:02, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-19) . . m Template:Planets Navbar (Added Euthora; removed Ea)
- 07:58, 19 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+97) . . N File:EuthoraIcon.png (ehhhhhhhhh... Tried to preserve Kuda's gradient as much as possible but it was a pain in the arse) (current)
- 21:13, 13 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-44) . . m Rowan
- 23:32, 12 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+338) . . Arias Errin
- 08:57, 10 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+2,944) . . Shadow Version 27 (→Relationships)
- 09:35, 7 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+21) . . m The Sealbreakers
- 02:18, 7 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+1,024) . . m Klaus Nortigren
- 01:35, 7 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Emma Isokoski
- 01:26, 7 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Houses of Osyrhia (Eebit moved page User:Nebulon Ranger/Projects/Houses of Osyrhia to Houses of Osyrhia without leaving a redirect: Figured that we might as well just bubble this up to the surface of the Wiki. Didn't even know it existed until I was poking around...)
- 09:49, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Shadow Version 27 (→Possessions: I AM SO DUMB)
- 09:34, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+6,729) . . Shadow Version 27
- 05:44, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+34) . . N Republic of St. Paul, Ferona (Eebit moved page Republic of St. Paul, Ferona to Republic of St. Paul) (current)
- 05:44, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Republic of St. Paul (Eebit moved page Republic of St. Paul, Ferona to Republic of St. Paul) (current)
- 05:43, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-471) . . m Ferona
- 05:34, 6 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-122) . . m Lycan (→Trivia: Not trivia pertaining to the species at large -- moving to Jack's page)
- 20:03, 5 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . m Garnere Range of Frequencies (→History)
- 21:40, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+490) . . Main Page
- 21:09, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-6) . . m User:Keileon (→Low Priority: Names of pages are firstname-lastname for now)
- 21:06, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+710) . . Manaverse
- 21:04, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m User:Red Revolver (→Unsorted)
- 20:54, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m User:Keileon (→"Don't even ask me to make these" Low Priority)
- 00:55, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Judas Numidius
- 00:55, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Azzan Dmitryus
- 00:29, 4 August 2015 (diff | hist) . . (+49) . . N File:FeronaIcon.png (The final(?) version of the Ferona planetary icon) (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)