User contributions
(newest | oldest) View (newer 100 | older 100) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 17:00, 2 November 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-2) . . m Auvresh
- 16:58, 2 November 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-3,339) . . Daeridune
- 16:51, 2 November 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+5,247) . . N Auvresh (Created page with "'''Auvresh''' is a Daeridite continent situated in the planet's western hemisphere. It is the second largest landmass on Daeridune. Prior to the apocalyptic even...")
- 02:05, 30 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m Daeridune
- 02:04, 30 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+2) . . m Daeridune
- 18:13, 16 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m User:Keileon/Arynea Skycrown (Added Rinul icon to infobox) (current)
- 00:00, 16 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+278) . . m User:Keileon/Arynea Skycrown (Added introduction section)
- 03:04, 10 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+64) . . m Daeridune
- 06:59, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+535) . . m Daeridune
- 06:30, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,436) . . m Daeridune (→Geography: Adding information from the thread)
- 06:14, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-12) . . m Template:Zhennka Shi Unit Navbar (Changed the 'u' on Ikan's name, removed Null) (current)
- 06:13, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+65) . . m Zhennka Shi Unit
- 06:08, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-33) . . m Template:Zhennka Shi Unit Navbar (Removed Ziera (and Miyoku))
- 06:07, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Template:Zhennka Shi Unit Navbar (Updated Minaro's surname)
- 05:36, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+42) . . m Template:Zhennka Shi Unit Navbar (Updated at Starr's request; pending further update(s) based on spelling of Minaro's surname)
- 04:41, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+11) . . m Zhennka Shi Unit
- 04:39, 3 October 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+84) . . m Zhennka Shi Unit
- 21:01, 28 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+134) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon)/Prologue (current)
- 21:00, 28 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+133) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon)/Season One (current)
- 19:13, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . m Soul Phantasm
- 02:57, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+267) . . m Manaverse Wiki:About (current)
- 02:54, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+595) . . N Manaverse Wiki:About (Moved Goals here)
- 02:34, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-4,041) . . m Manaverse ([22:32:39] <Shadow>: Obliterate everything else)
- 02:14, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-364) . . m Main Page (Added Recent Changes, removed "Goals" as they were all outdated.) (current)
- 02:06, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,029) . . N Soul Phantasm (Starting this page)
- 01:40, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+77) . . m Manaverse (→Aethers)
- 01:28, 24 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-334) . . m Manaverse (Reworded Soul Phantasm section with information gleaned from discussion the other week)
- 21:00, 1 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . m User:Red Revolver/Sky Serpent (Reorganizing information) (current)
- 21:00, 1 August 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+35) . . m User:Red Revolver/Nekuna
- 22:21, 29 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+15) . . m Ferona (Deriving the information from Dark's post here: http://www.zejroleplaying.org/showthread.php?tid=2412&pid=42123#pid42123)
- 22:14, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+59) . . m Manaverse Periodic Table
- 22:13, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . m Garnere Range of Frequencies (current)
- 22:11, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . m Darius
- 22:10, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . m Lord X-Giga-X
- 22:09, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+10) . . m Rokans (current)
- 22:08, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+36) . . m Ferona
- 22:07, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . m Diclonius
- 22:06, 22 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . m Jack Evans (current)
- 20:40, 14 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+20) . . m Template:Cult of Ustream Navbar (Adding a couple links, moved Zaiek into affiliation with SoS)
- 20:37, 14 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+864) . . m Zaiek Kierrmi (Cleaning up the page, adding links, adding navbars, adding categories)
- 06:02, 12 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+50) . . m Boravel
- 20:39, 11 July 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+134) . . m Jack Evans (Updated template. Rearranged some information. Fixed capitalization style (remember that Manaverse Wiki is case-sensitive for titles and we capitalize everything))
- 23:58, 1 June 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m Elemental Spectrum (→Properties)
- 08:14, 23 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,079) . . Cult of Ustream (Canon)
- 22:42, 20 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+40) . . m Babelspeech
- 18:32, 17 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+499) . . m Template:Infobox Planet (current)
- 04:40, 17 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Emma Isokoski (→Trivia: Figured that this would warrant one of them fancy "sub-bullet points")
- 22:39, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-3) . . m Manaverse (→Worlds)
- 22:19, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (Minor grammatical error that Kuda caught)
- 22:18, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1,166) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (→Season Two: Adding a basic summary)
- 21:24, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+546) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (→Setting)
- 21:10, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+550) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon)
- 20:23, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+380) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (→Dramatis Personae: Adding in a little bit of information on the characters)
- 20:07, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+213) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (→Prologue: Small expansion and a bit of rewording)
- 19:57, 13 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-46) . . m Cult of Ustream (Canon) (Removing the "Season Three" section for the time being, as it won't be filled out for quite a while yet.)
- 06:10, 12 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Dreams on the Horizon (i missed) (current)
- 06:09, 12 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+24) . . m Dreams on the Horizon (→Roleplay Introduction: Wanted to have the formatting in line with what Kuda had set up for KeM's page)
- 22:30, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Stiria (→Burst Mode) (current)
- 22:19, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+16) . . m Stiria
- 22:15, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+79) . . File:Stiria.jpg (current)
- 22:15, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+72) . . N File:Stiria.jpg (Image of Stiria, from Kel en Miir's profile thread. Original artist: ???)
- 07:17, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+26) . . N Kel en Miir (Thought it might be worth it to set up this redirect) (current)
- 05:24, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+8) . . m Shockwing (Adding appropriate surnames in the infobox as requested by Starr)
- 05:04, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+102) . . m Shockwing (→Trivia: Copped some hot info from Starr's Twitter)
- 05:01, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+203) . . m Dreams on the Horizon
- 04:56, 10 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+29) . . m Ellon (current)
- 19:02, 4 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+148) . . m Vodera
- 19:00, 4 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Ra'nun Agma (can't believe i messed that up) (current)
- 19:00, 4 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-192) . . m Ra'nun Agma
- 18:57, 4 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+58) . . m Airakou Blodfjäder
- 06:57, 1 May 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+3,322) . . N Elemental Spectrum (I've been sitting on this information for a little while, might as well get something up and working.)
- 05:52, 27 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+60) . . Valen Scarletburn (→Trivia: important, trufax)
- 20:26, 26 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+1) . . m Liliyani Minskemiln (TODO: Update to new template)
- 20:24, 26 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-8) . . m Reikovic Minskemiln (TODO: Update to new template, update Raiden's relationship lol) (current)
- 20:21, 26 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-173) . . m Tatsuo Yoshiro (TODO: Get Tatsuo a colour, update to newer template, adjust History sections, etc.) (current)
- 20:19, 26 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Shadow Version 27
- 20:19, 26 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-5) . . m Xanadu Paperblack
- 08:49, 25 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-1) . . m Raiden Version 23 (a n o t h e r o n e)
- 08:44, 25 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+55) . . N Category:Quirenyun's Imprinted Characters (Eebit moved page Category:Quirenyun's Imprinted Characters to Category:Kirenyun's Imprinted Characters: New title) (current)
- 08:44, 25 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Category:Kirenyun's Imprinted Characters (Eebit moved page Category:Quirenyun's Imprinted Characters to Category:Kirenyun's Imprinted Characters: New title) (current)
- 08:43, 25 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-37) . . m Raiden Version 23 (Updated the template, still needs to have information rearranged and updated)
- 18:37, 23 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-16) . . m Garnere Range of Frequencies (→Theories connected to the Range: Renaming redlink for when we get to making Vibration Theory's page proper)
- 21:35, 22 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+2,824) . . m User:Keileon/Rinul (→Theology: Adding Zio's theology to the page)
- 20:34, 20 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+18) . . m User:Keileon/Rinul (→List of Rinian Characters [Deprecated])
- 23:34, 19 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+56) . . m User:Keileon/Rinul
- 02:40, 11 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+22) . . m Euthora/Native Species
- 06:35, 9 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+316) . . m Domain (→Implications)
- 06:24, 9 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+4,602) . . N Domain (Getting information onto the Wiki so that it can be added to and browsed by the community at large)
- 00:19, 5 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+198) . . m Demon (Updating to reflect new developments)
- 21:43, 4 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+14) . . m Ra'nun Agma
- 21:24, 4 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+67) . . m Vansyr/Native Species
- 21:23, 4 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Vansyr/Native Species (→Psuedowyverns: typo check)
- 20:41, 4 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+115) . . m Vansyr/Native Species
- 20:35, 4 April 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . m Vansyr (→Native Species)
- 17:55, 29 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+32) . . m Vansyr
- 19:27, 28 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+44) . . m Rowan (Adding icon to infobox)
- 19:23, 28 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . File:Rinul icon.png (Eebit uploaded a new version of File:Rinul icon.png) (current)
- 04:59, 24 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (-120) . . m Vansyr (Tidying up a little, removing placeholders, etc.)
- 00:33, 24 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (0) . . m Vansyr (→Southern Archipelago also name pending(™): lol oops guess we found the strikethrough)
- 00:25, 22 March 2016 (diff | hist) . . (+7) . . m Template:Organization G-X Navbar (current)
(newest | oldest) View (newer 100 | older 100) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)